Accounts and annual returns ANCHOR TRUST

Charity Number: 1052183
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 07 January 2016 On Time