Governing document ANCHOR TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS TOGETHER WITH THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL FRAILTY, ILLNESS OR DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THEIR ACCOMMODATION, CARE, SUPPORT, RELIEF AND TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.