LONDON SCHOOLS ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate all x-country and athletics events at school level in London. We take county teams to E.S.A.A x-country and athletics championships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bridget Yule | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Walker | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dale Dapaah | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Soalla Bell | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RAVEN SHERLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.30k | £9.20k | £8.39k | £20.13k | £29.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.90k | £6.10k | £7.76k | £26.22k | £30.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD NOVEMBER 1994 AND AMENDED 6TH DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL FITNESS AND DEVELOPMENT, THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF ORGANISED ATHLETICS, AMONGST CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OF FURTHER EDUCATION WITHIN THE BOROUGHS OF INNER LONDON.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE BOROUGHS OF INNER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ROBERTON DRIVE
BROMLEY
BR1 3AT
- Phone:
- 02084641806
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window