ASSISTANCE SUPPORT AND SELF HELP IN SURVIVING TRAUMA

Charity number: 1052219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ASSIST offers therapeutic and emotional support to individuals and their families/carers affected by Post Traumatic Stress (PTS) and Post Traumatic Stress Disorder (PTSD). PTS is defined as an illness or disorder that is triggered by an emotionally distressing event which is outside the range of normal human experience, e.g. traffic incidents; fires; attacks: rape; and traumatic bereavement.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £475,723
Total expenditure: £417,730

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ASSIST POST TRAUMATIC STRESS SUPPORT (Working name)
  • ASSIST TRAUMA CARE (Working name)
  • ASSISTANCE SUPPORT AND SELF-HELP IN SURVIVING TRAUMA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD WELLINGS Chair 12 December 2019
None on record
Mike Hutton Trustee 21 January 2020
None on record
KRISTIAN SHAW Trustee 12 December 2019
None on record
Dr THOMAS GOODFELLOW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £672.65k £632.67k £564.62k £403.53k £475.72k
Total expenditure £661.52k £558.24k £608.99k £519.57k £417.73k
Income from government contracts £653.66k £609.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £653.66k £632.67k £564.62k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £19.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £661.52k £558.24k £608.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 17 Clock Tower Shopping Centre
Northway
Rugby
Warwickshire
CV21 2JR
Phone:
01788551919