FAITH MISSIONS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Helping the poor children of India. 2. Running a bible school and mobile medical unit in India. 3. Raising funds to maintain these projects, including buildings and vehicles. 4. Disaster relief. 5. Support of care and rehabilitation work in Mumbai. 6. Support of indigenous charity workers overseas. 7. Support of an evangelical work in Uganda. 8. Help with poor children in Poland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- India
- Poland
- Uganda
Governance
- 31 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Hayward | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA IVY OLIVE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY REBECCA CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.25k | £107.82k | £69.39k | £66.46k | £93.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.82k | £104.31k | £65.40k | £66.98k | £88.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION LOAN GIFT SUBSCRIPTION OR OTHERWISE:- (1)THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION. (11)THE ADDVANCEMENT OF THE EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS. (111)THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE SPREAD OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (1V)THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY. (V)THE HELP END COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 STOWE CRESCENT
RUISLIP
HA4 7SR
- Phone:
- 01895635356
- Email:
- fmt.scott@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window