THE FRIENDS OF CAWOOD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1052255
Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent/carer/teacher association raising funds for the benefit of children attending Cawood Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £5,738
Total expenditure: £2,063

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Davison Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Katy Woodmason Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Sally Benson Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £6.26k £7.69k £3.03k £396 £5.74k
Total expenditure £4.63k £2.93k £12.15k £321 £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cawood C Of E Primary School
Broad Lane
Cawood
SELBY
North Yorkshire
YO8 3SQ
Phone:
01757268368
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available