WESTOVER LITTLE STARS

Charity Number: 1052273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a playgroup, from children two and a half until ready for school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £130,604
Total expenditure: £116,959

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WESTOVER UNDER FIVES PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenna Salter Chair 23 February 2023
None on record
Ludmila Slapina Trustee 14 February 2025
None on record
Amy Dean Trustee 14 February 2025
None on record
Charlotte Turner Trustee 09 November 2018
None on record
SARAH LESLEY PERRETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £116.84k £119.56k £119.56k £112.33k £130.60k
Total expenditure £112.34k £97.41k £104.54k £120.30k £116.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Westover little stars
Westover Green school
Westover Green
Bridgwater
Somerset
TA6 7HB
Phone:
07527437331
Website:

No information available