Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BROOKE SCHOOL (WARWICKSHIRE)

Charity number: 1052294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 13 December 2023 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 27 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required