Financial history FRIENDS OF BROOKE SCHOOL (WARWICKSHIRE)

Charity number: 1052294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £12.81k £4.01k £6.68k £512 £1.28k
Total expenditure £3.96k £803 £13.57k £6.99k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A