THE THEATRE IN PRISONS AND PROBATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE AIM TO PROVIDE PEOPLE WITH A MEANS TO GAIN MORE CONTROL OVER THEIR LIVES AND TO IMPROVE ITS QUALITY. TO ENABLE THIS WE USE THEATRE TECHNIQUES AND OTHER ART FORMS. PARTICIPATION IS AT THE CORE OF OUR WORK - OUR WORK HAS THREE MAIN AREAS OF FOCUS - PRACTICE WORKING WITHIN PRISON AND YOUNG OFFENDER INSTITUTION INMATES, PROBATION CLIENTS, AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT RISK, TRAINING,CONSULTANCY & ADVOCACY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £254,880 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 January 1996: Standard registration
- THE T I P P CENTRE (Working name)
- THEATRE IN PRISONS AND PROBATION CENTRE (Working name)
- TIPP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Mark Kenny | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clare Fuller | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Martine Spence | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PONSILLO | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ann Struthers | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Grace Cunningham | Trustee | 24 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JEFFERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.12k | £215.48k | £160.98k | £203.27k | £541.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.47k | £114.52k | £203.61k | £247.65k | £237.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £254.88k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £210.15k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £237.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £74 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £353.78k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PRISONERS, EX-OFFENDERS, VULNERABLE PEOPLE AT RISK OF OFFENDING AND THOSE WORKING WITHIN THE JUSTICE SYSTEM, HEALTH SERVICES, EDUCATION AND VOLUNTARY SECTORS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PARTICIPATORY ARTS; AND TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE PURE AND APPLIED RESEARCH INTO THE IMPACTS OF THE ARTS OF THOSE WITHIN THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM OR AT RISK OF BEING SO AND TO PUBLISH ANY USEFUL RESULTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO AIDING REHABILITATION AND PREVENTING CRIMINAL ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER
OXFORD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M13 9PL
- Phone:
- 01612753047
- Email:
- admin@tipp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window