KIRKBY ON BAIN PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 January 1996: Standard registration
- KIRKBY SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DAVID BREWSTER | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Emily Dowland | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
SEAN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Matt Savage | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
GEORGINA DAY | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Helen Eke | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev MARGARET DONE | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
IAN GEORGE READ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.61k | £3.13k | £788 | £1.75k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.50k | £4.63k | £135 | £1.63k | £1.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF KIRKBY ON BAIN C E (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
THE PUPILS OF KIRKBY ON BAIN C E (AIDED) PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIRKBY ON BAIN C OF E PRIMARY
SCHOOL
WHARF LANE
KIRKBY ON BAIN
WOODHALL SPA
LN10 6YW
- Phone:
- 01526352715
- Email:
- admin@kobps.lincs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window