Trustees 2ND SOUTH LEEDS BELLE ISLE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1052322

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Halliwell | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Walton | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Crisp | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Makensie Harrison | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Harrision | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmy Clarkson | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Aris | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Beck | Trustee | 16 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
SHARON FARRAR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.