LADY BAY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the school community in its ambition to provide the best possible experience for all the pupils of Lady Bay Primary School and in particular through its fund raising efforts, to enable those ambitions to be realised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 26 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Caroline Louisa Phillipson | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine John | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Claire Starr | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Crook | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Allen | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Kristy Angell | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA DEWDNEY-YORK | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.25k | £12.47k | £11.53k | £21.87k | £19.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.29k | £13.24k | £20.69k | £10.70k | £9.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 June 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lady Bay Primary School
Trent Boulevard
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 5BD
- Phone:
- 07769710126
- Email:
- ladybayschoolassoc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window