Trustees LADY BAY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052324
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Caroline Louisa Phillipson Chair 10 October 2022
None on record
Catherine John Trustee 18 October 2024
None on record
Danielle Claire Starr Trustee 18 October 2024
None on record
Christina Crook Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Emma Allen Trustee 01 October 2019
LADY BAY PRE-SCHOOL
Received: 31 days late
Kristy Angell Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
REBECCA DEWDNEY-YORK Trustee 10 October 2015
None on record