HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages 331 designated plus 6 restricted funds across our four hospital sites and throughout the community, aiming to raise money for the various NHS specialities attached to the Heart of England NHS Foundation Trust, for public and patient benefit. We help organise and promote various appeals and also encourage and guide individuals with their own fundraising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income:
£1,871,000
Donations and legacies | £894.00k | |
Charitable activities | £635.00k | |
Other trading activities | £126.00k | |
Investments | £216.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,948,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.87m | |
Other | £0 |
£963,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £83.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.87m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £83.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.87m | |
Retained for future use | £886.00k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 December 1996: Standard registration
- 20 October 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITY (Working name)
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS HOSPITAL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.64m | £1.58m | £1.53m | £1.39m | £1.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65m | £2.27m | £1.87m | £2.08m | £1.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £804.00k | £820.00k | £760.00k | £588.00k | £894.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £79.00k | £103.00k | £103.00k | £110.00k | £126.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £451.00k | £344.00k | £444.00k | £404.00k | £635.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £304.00k | £312.00k | £225.00k | £237.00k | £216.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £55.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £168.00k | £296.00k | £191.00k | £174.00k | £282.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.57m | £2.18m | £1.60m | £1.92m | £1.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £161.00k | £83.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £37.00k | £38.00k | £39.00k | £0 | £99.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £26.00k | £34.00k | £44.00k | £43.00k | £51.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.20m | £7.61m | £8.10m | £7.66m | £8.08m | |
|
Other assets | £1.58m | £1.30m | £607.00k | £238.00k | £485.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £212.00k | £613.00k | £267.00k | £518.00k | £300.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 20 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/11/1995, AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ACCIDENT AND EMERGENCY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ARTHRITIS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - BEAUCHAMP WARD (GP UNIT)
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - BEECH WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - BEECH WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - BIRMINGHAM CHEST CLINIC
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - BREAST SERVICE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - BRITTLE ASTHMA
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CANCER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CARDIAC MEDICAL TECHNICIANS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CARDIAC REHABILITATION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CARDIOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CARDIOLOGY EDUCATIONAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHAIRMANS FUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHAIRMANS FUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHEST CME
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHEST DIVISION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHILD GASTROENTEROLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHILD HEALTH
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHILD HEALTH
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHILDRENS CHEST MEDICINE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CHILDRENS WARD / DEPARTMENTS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CLEMENT DIXON CANCER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CLORECTAL CANCER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - COMMUNICABLE AND TROPICAL DISEASES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CONTINUING CARE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CYSTIC FIBROSIS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CYSTIC FIBROSIS AND FRIENDS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CYSTIC FIBROSIS CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CYSTIC FIBROSIS COMPUTER EQUIPMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - CYSTIC FIBROSIS PATIENTS COMFORTS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIABETES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIABETES CARE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIABETES CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIABETES COMPLICATIONS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIABETES MELLITUS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIABETIC CHILDREN
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DIETETICS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - DISABILITY TRAINING
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ELDERLY MEDICINE DAY HOSPITAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ELDERLY MEDICINE GENERAL PURPOSES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ELDERLY MEDICINE LIBRARY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ELDERLY MEDICINE OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ELDERLY MEDICINE PHYSIOTHERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ENDOSCOPY SUITE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - EOIN THOMAS MEMORIAL GENERAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GASTRO INTESTINAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GASTRO INTESTINAL SURGERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GENERAL PURPOSES (GENERAL UNIT)
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GENERAL SURGERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - GENERAL UNIT MEDICINE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - HAEMATOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - HEARING CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - HIV
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - IMMUNOLOGY EDUCATIONAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - INDIGESTION RELIEF
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - INFECTION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - INFECTION CONTROL NURSING
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - INNOVATIONS IN PRACTICE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ITU
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - LEUKAEMIA
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - LIPID
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - LOTTERY GENERAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - LUNG CANCER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - LUNG DISEASE UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - LUNG HEALTH APPEAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - ASPEN WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - CEDARWOOD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - LABOUR WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - MAPEL WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - MEDICAL RECORDS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - NEONATAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - PHYSIOTHERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - RADIOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - ROWAN WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MATERNITY UNIT - ULTRASOUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - MEDICAL PHOTOGRAPHY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - NURSES GROUP EDUCATION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - NUTRIONAL SUPPORT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OBESITY AND NON INSULIN DEPENDENT DIABETES MELLITUS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OCCUPATIONAL LUNG
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OESOPHAGEAL CANCER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OPTHALMIC OUTPATIENTS / STAFF
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OPTHALMOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OPTICIANS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ORTHOPTIC
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - OUTPATIENTS DEPARTMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - PAEDIATRIC NEUROMUSCULAR DISORDER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - PAEDIATRIC RESPIRATORY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - PAEDIATRIC SURGERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - PERINATAL AUDIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - PHARMACY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - PHYSIOTHERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - POSTGRADUATE CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - POSTGRADUATE VIRAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RADIOGRAPHERS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RADIOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RADIOLOGY EDUCATIONAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RENAL UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RESPIRATORY HEALTH
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RESPIRATORY PHYSIOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - RETINAL SURGERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SIMEG
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ACCIDENT UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ANAESTHETIC DEPARTMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ANTENATAL SERVICES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ASPLEY DAY HOSPITAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL BREAST CANCER
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL BRONCHIAL INFLAMMATION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL CARE 4
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL CHAPLAINS FUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL CLINICAL CHEMISTRY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL COHEN BEQUEST
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL COLLEGE OF MIDWIFERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL CORONARY CARE UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL CRADLE PICTURES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL CYTOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL DAY UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL DIETETIC SCIENCE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL DISTRICT GENERAL HOSPITAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ELDERLY REHABILITATION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ENDOSCOPY UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL GASTROENTEROLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL GENERAL MANAGEMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL GYNAECOLOGY RESEARCH
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL GYNAECOLOGY WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL HAEMATOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL HOSPITAL GENERAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL INFECTION CONTROL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL INTENSIVE THERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL LABOUR WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL LASER APPEAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL MATERNITY INFORMATION PROJECT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL MATERNITY UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL MEDICAL AND SURGICAL EQUIPMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL MEDICAL GENERAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL MEDICAL INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL MICROBIOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL O AND G DIRECTORATE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL OBSTETRIC WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ONCOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL ORTHOPAEDIC DEPARTMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL OUTPATIENTS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL P NEEDHAM FUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL PAIN RELIEF
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL PARENT CRAFT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL PATHOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL PHARMACY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT NURSING
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL RESOURCE MANAGEMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL RHEUMATOLOGY SERVICES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL SCBU QUALITY TEAM
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL SPECIAL CARE BABY UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL STAFF AMENTITIES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL THERAPY SERVICES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL UROLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 11
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 12
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 14
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 15
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 16
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 17
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 18
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 19
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 5
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 8
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL WARD 9
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SOLIHULL X-RAY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - STOMATHERAPY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - THEATRES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - THORACIC SURGERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - TISSUE VIABILITY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - ULTRASOUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - VASCULAR
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - VERA WHITEHEAD GENERAL FUND
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 1
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 10
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 11
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 17
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 2
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 25
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 26
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 27
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 29
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 3
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 30
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 4
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 5
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 6
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 7
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 8
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) - WARD 9
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -BACTERIOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -CHILD DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -GENETICS/CYTOGENICS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) GLAUCOMA
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -HAEMATOLOGY LABORATORY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) HAMPTON WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL DIABETES CARE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -HISTOPATHOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) HIV GENITO URINARY MEDICINE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -IMMUNOLOGY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) ITU EDUCATION
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) LUNG CANCER THERAPY ADVANCEMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) MARSTON WARD
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -NUCLEAR MEDICINE
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) NURSING DEVELOPMENT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) PAEDIATRIC GROWTH
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -PAEDIATRIC OPTHALMOLOGY / STRABISMUS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) PATHOLOGY COMMON SERVICES
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) PERINATAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) PRACTICE DEVELOPMENT UNIT
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) RADIOLOGY INTERVENTIONAL
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) SOLIHULL GENERAL SURGERY
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -SPORTS CLINIC
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) SWALLOWING DISORDER CLINIC
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) -VIRUS
- BIRMINGHAM HEARTLANDS AND SOLIHULL NHS TRUST (TEACHING) WARD 12
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CANCER RESEARCH, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT CHARITY
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST HOLLIER CHARITY
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CHARITY
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST RESEARCH FUND CHARITY
- HEART OF ENGLAND NHS FOUNDATION TRUST SPECIALISED EQUIPMENT FUND CHARITY
- 24 December 1996 : Standard registration
- 20 October 2006 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window