Financial history ISLAMIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1052332
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £87.21k £97.10k £104.62k £131.73k £205.71k
Total expenditure £70.71k £75.00k £85.48k £86.77k £101.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A