CHESTERFIELD CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a neutral venue for separated parents who do not have child custody to meet with their child(ren).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 January 1996: Standard registration
- CHESTERFIELD CONTACT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Diane Lee | Chair | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Wood | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Murray | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH RALPH | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA PATTERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.17k | £4.15k | £3.95k | £4.14k | £8.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.65k | £4.04k | £7.68k | £7.41k | £8.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE DISTRICT OF CHESTERFIELD CAUSED BY THE BREAKUP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE AND FACILITIES WHEREBY SUCH CHILDREN CAN MORE READILY ENJOY THE COMPANY AND LOVE OF THEIR NON-RESIDENTIAL PARENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHESTERFIELD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chesterfield Baptist Church
Cross Street
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S40 4ST
- Phone:
- 07803785305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window