THE STANDING CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSITY TEACHING AND RESEARCH IN THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance knowledge and understanding in all aspects of learning, education and training in adulthood. In particular but not exclusively through the provision of conferences and seminars and to facilitate and enhance the contributions to that advancement by those teaching, researching and studying the education of adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 1996: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 January 2012: Re-registered
- 03 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1190891 UNIVERSITIES ASSOCIATION FOR LIFELONG LEARNING
- SCUTREA (Working name)
- STANDING CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSITY AND RESEARCH IN THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £560 | £2.86k | £200 | £1 | £14 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.95k | £2.68k | £180 | £0 | £887 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 June 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 June 2024 | 487 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 February 2024 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 13/07/1995 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/1998 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING IN ALL ASPECTS OF LEARNING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ADULTHOOD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS AND TO FACILITATE AND ENHANCE THE CONTRIBUTIONS TO THAT ADVANCEMENT BY THOSE TEACHING RESEARCHING AND STUDYING THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window