WALTON HEALTH CENTRE PATIENTS PARTICIPATION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for patients at Walton Health Centre by funding equipment, improving resources, publishing a newsletter and organising health information events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 January 1996: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- WALTON HEALTH CENTRE PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £289 | £25 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 28 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 05 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORUMS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND THE PUBLICATION OF A NEWSLETTER DEVOTED TO HEALTHCARE. (2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR THE PURCHASE AND MAINTENANCE OF MEDICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT FOR WALTON HEALTH CENTRE, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL, REGIONAL OR LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window