Governing document CHILD CONCERN
Charity number: 1052381

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1990 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 1995, 23 APRIL 1998, 25 APRIL 2001 AND 23 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO WORK TO FURTHER AND IMPROVE THE KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF ALL PERSONS INVOLVED AND INTERESTED IN THE LAW AND PRACTICE RELATING TO CHILDREN AND CHILDREN'S ISSUES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.