Trustees CHILD CONCERN
Charity number: 1052381

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Doyle | Chair | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA BUCKLEY | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ELLIE WHITESIDE-HUNT | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ellingham | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATE HELLIN | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Farah Hussain | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jagdish Kaur Barn | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aneela Pilkington | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Jackson | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Frank Margison | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Camille Scott | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK HODSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.