Trustees LEICESTER MUSEUMS TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1052391

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY KENDAL | Chair | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Corley | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sole | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denis Swann | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Corley | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bates | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ian Dibben | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Atkins | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JAMES LEYLAND CRAMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN JOHN GILLESPIE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN HEADLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER RICHARD CAUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.