Financial history SADHU VASWANI CENTRE

Charity number: 1052439
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.02k £33.03k £42.86k £78.62k £51.66k
Total expenditure £29.08k £11.34k £20.27k £61.00k £47.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.00k £17.00k N/A