HASTINGS GATEWAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hastings Gateway Club provides social & recreational activities for adults with learning difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 14 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN JOAN JEFFRIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY MARGARET FRANCIS CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
M ark Johnson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.63k | £1.87k | £0 | £3.25k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01k | £7.07k | £0 | £2.49k | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 2 NOVEMBER 1966, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
"LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE; (1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDENTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND (2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GRANGE AVENUE
HASTINGS
TN34 2QE
- Phone:
- 01424429230
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window