Financial history COMMUNITY BASE

Charity number: 1052456
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £545.19k £406.59k £432.40k £534.42k £526.69k
Total expenditure £487.44k £444.68k £450.78k £530.38k £496.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £32.00k N/A N/A £32.00k £32.00k
Income - Charitable activities £512.48k N/A N/A £477.83k £491.79k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £708 N/A N/A £1.86k £1.86k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £22.73k £1.04k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £487.44k N/A N/A £530.38k £496.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £496.48k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0