CAVALCADE OF COSTUME LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of The Cavalcade of Costume Limited are to provide for the advancement of public education a museum for the display of costumes together with such other exhibits or items of social history or other educational interest from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,780 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 January 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Stevens | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Anya Glinski | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clare Mitchener | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jill Holmes | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Lindlar | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lucy Pride | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Margaret Walter | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.50k | £48.58k | £99.70k | £77.99k | £44.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.19k | £23.11k | £39.57k | £84.35k | £108.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.62k | £29.50k | £24.14k | £22.84k | £6.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 1995, AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 1996, AND 24 MARCH 2004 NULL AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION A MUSEUM FOR THE DISPLAY OF COSTUMES TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS OF SOCIAL HISTORICAL OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL INTEREST FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAVALCADE OF COSTUME LIMITED
LIME TREE HOUSE
11 THE PLOCKS
BLANDFORD FORUM
DORSET
DT11 7AA
- Phone:
- 01258 453006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window