Financial history THE PET CHARITY

Charity number: 1052488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £67.49k £18.92k £48.12k £16.41k £23.21k
Total expenditure £76.79k £68.99k £51.90k £41.32k £125.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A