THE PET CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educate the public regarding responsible pet ownership both directly eg by posting animal care leaflets on our websites for free download and holding events that are open to anyone with an interest in pet care, and indirectly eg by running education and training courses for pet specialists who meet the public daily.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 January 1996: Standard registration
- PET CARE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- PET CARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Wigley | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Adam Carey | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maeve Mary Moorcroft | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Burgess | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Perry | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Brian Whitmee | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Newman | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.49k | £18.92k | £48.12k | £16.41k | £23.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.79k | £68.99k | £51.90k | £41.32k | £125.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/12/2013 as amended on 12 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION AND THE HEALTH OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO OR LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE HYGIENE GROOMING NUTRITION BOARDING AND SAFETY OF SUCH ANIMALS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pet Charity
Bigods Bungaow
Bigods Lane
Gt Dunmow
Essex
CM6 3BE
- Phone:
- 01371 878420
- Email:
- info@thepetcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window