Trustees THE PET CHARITY

Charity number: 1052488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Wigley Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Peter Adam Carey Trustee 19 January 2021
None on record
Dr Maeve Mary Moorcroft Trustee 06 August 2019
None on record
Adrian Burgess Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
David Perry Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
Dominic Brian Whitmee Trustee 20 July 2017
None on record
Christopher Newman Trustee 19 June 2014
None on record