Financial history PEN-Y-CWM PARENTS STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £951 £7.39k
Total expenditure £31.57k £0 £0 £0 £3.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A