THE OPEN BIBLE FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
108 - Religious activities 207 - General public/Mankind 306 - Provides services (eg care/counselling)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 03 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE DENNIS ALLEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Brockhurst | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE ALLEN | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.50k | £4.62k | £2.28k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.41k | £6.69k | £3.61k | £3.83k | £1.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED ON 3 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE UTTOXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 STAFFORD ROAD
UTTOXETER
ST14 8DN
- Phone:
- 01889565478
- Email:
- SUMMERFIELDS20@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window