Accounts and annual returns THE BRIDGE CHURCH BOLTON

Charity Number: 1052526
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 11 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 29 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 30 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 30 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 28 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 28 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 30 December 2005 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 30 December 2005 60 days late