Accounts and annual returns ELEVATE CHURCH

Charity number: 1052529
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 January 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 04 January 2016 16 January 2017 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2016 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2015 11 June 2016 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 04 January 2014 01 April 2015 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2014 Not Required