Accounts and annual returns RENEW CHURCH

Charity Number: 1052530
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On Time