CADISHEAD COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cadishead Community Church works in the community providing a place for all to come. Open Door: Tuesdays 10am-12 Come & Meet new friends, if anyone needs a chat or prayer someone is always available to help. We provide tea, coffee & pastries. Church Services Sunday 10:30am, Wed bible Study 7:30pm, Children's Sunday School. Please visit our Website for more information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Salford City
Governance
- 05 February 1996: Standard registration
- NEW LIFE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN OCONNOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS RYAN | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Marian Temitope Mofomosara Ogunsola | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ekundayo Lasode | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN KEAN | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.21k | £44.42k | £45.77k | £33.83k | £54.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.88k | £32.91k | £39.98k | £36.32k | £41.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CADISHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cadishead Community Church
112 Liverpool Rd
Salford
Greater Manchester
M44 5AN
- Phone:
- 01617757822
- Email:
- cadisheadcc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window