BRISTOL SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charitable company are to provide and promote shopmobility services to those with mobility impairments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,050 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 02 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhiannon MacLaren | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bobby Oliver | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Roberts | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Kennedy | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE PITCHERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.55k | £27.81k | £56.04k | £51.92k | £47.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.11k | £48.68k | £54.83k | £49.73k | £52.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £32.00k | £21.00k | £22.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 1991 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES TO ASSIST AND IMPROVE THE MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEED OF SUCH PERSONS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BRISTOL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shop Mobility
Cabot Circus Car Park
Newfoundland Circus
Bristol
BS2 9AB
- Phone:
- 01179559083
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window