Financial history FRIENDS OF STAPLEGROVE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.64k £3.12k £1.41k £4.77k £8.44k
Total expenditure £3.83k £6.68k £501 £3.08k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A