Financial history LIFE CHURCH DONCASTER

Charity number: 1052567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.10k £38.02k £35.22k £110.00k £72.83k
Total expenditure £36.70k £34.83k £38.95k £49.05k £68.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £200 £1.10k £2.60k £1.75k