Financial history REDGRAVE AMENITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1052572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/09/2020 11/09/2021 11/09/2022 11/09/2023 11/09/2024
Total gross income £4.21k £1.56k £2.80k £277 £455
Total expenditure £5.98k £4.33k £1.96k £1.16k £137
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A