Accounts and annual returns LIFE CHANGE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1052592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 May 2025 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 May 2025 552 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 December 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required