ZION CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities incorporating outreach and help into the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warrington
- Wigan
Governance
- 05 February 1996: Standard registration
- 24 October 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1205542 ZION CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- Lowton and Golborne Community Church (Working name)
- LOWTON COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.36k | £50.18k | £43.56k | £48.02k | £36.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.90k | £136.78k | £17.63k | £20.98k | £60.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 23 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BOLTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window