FULL LIFE CHURCH (MALTBY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Full Life Church exists to promote the Christian faith and serve our wider community through Church services, outreach and community projects. These projects include supporting members of our local community through daily activities, such as Foodbank, Warm Hub, Coffee House, supported housing for vulnerable people, weekly activities for children and young people, and training and conferencing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 February 1996: Standard registration
- 03 October 2024: Funds received from 523775 MALTBY COLLIERY INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND SC...
- FULL LIFE CHURCH AND CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- FULL LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR PAUL NORRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Raybould | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Norris | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pastor KD Foster | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £262.40k | £183.73k | £160.67k | £234.75k | £241.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £313.96k | £173.29k | £162.84k | £210.33k | £224.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £71.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £31.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 NOVEMBER 1993 AND CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ROTHERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH STREET
MALTBY
ROTHERHAM
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S66 8LF
- Phone:
- 01709818213
- Email:
- info@full-life.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window