ANGEL GREEN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1052622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sunday worship. Bible study. Prayer meeting. Men's meeting. Ladies meeting. Youth fellowship. Children's work - Group/Activities. Homeless - Group/Welfare, Community Kitchen

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £39,643
Total expenditure: £23,373

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRACY OSBORNE Chair
None on record
David OSBORNE Trustee 02 October 2022
BARTON LANE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PAULA WIKINS Trustee 02 October 2022
None on record
Christopher Wilkins Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
EMMA GILCHRIST Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record
STEPHEN GILCHRIST GILCHRIST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.60k £15.48k £18.90k £22.48k £39.64k
Total expenditure £16.03k £17.67k £18.53k £20.65k £23.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 06 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2024 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Appleton Close
Clifton
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 8RD
Phone:
01159217830
Website:

No information available