FRIENDS OF BEECH GROVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HOLD FUND RAISING EVENTS TO FUND EQUIPMENT AND TRIPS FOR THE SCHOOL CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 02 February 1996: Standard registration
- F O B G (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheree Wigglesworth | Chair | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Powell | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Chugg | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Davy | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Brady | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.19k | £5.22k | £5.30k | £1.86k | £10.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16k | £59 | £4.11k | £0 | £2.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2021 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beech Grove Primary School
Courtland Road
WELLINGTON
Somerset
TA21 8NE
- Phone:
- 01823662438
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window