THE DALES CHRISTIAN CENTRE - WIRKSWORTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHRISTIAN WORSHIP SERVICES INCLUDING COMMUNION, WORSHIP THROUGH MUSIC AND SONG (DWELL), PRAYER,TEACHING AND PREACHING FROM THE BIBLE. OTHER ACTIVITIES INCLUDE SENIOR'S LUNCH CLUB (OASIS).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 February 1996: Standard registration
- 19 June 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 June 2014: Funds transferred to 1154376 LIFE CHURCH MATLOCK LTD
- LIGHTHOUSE CLUB (Working name)
- OASIS CLUB (Working name)
- PLAY N LEARN PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- DERBYSHIRE DALES CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.07k | £35.33k | £61.22k | £33.69k | £25.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.46k | £36.11k | £49.83k | £36.65k | £21.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 11 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 11 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 23 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 23 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 12 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 12 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 16 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 16 May 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND TRUST DEED ADOPTED 09 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WIRKSWORTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window