Financial history JACK AND JILL TODDLER GROUP (STOKE)

Charity number: 1052649
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £2.32k £2.95k £3.09k £3.21k £2.86k
Total expenditure £2.36k £2.66k £2.55k £2.61k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A