FRIENDS OF CASTLE CAMPS C OF E VOLUNTARY CONTROLLED PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the education of the pupils in the school. In furtherance of this object the association may: develop more extended relationship between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. Engage in activities which support the school and enhance the education of the pupils attending it. Provide and assist in the provision of such facilities or items for education at the school (n
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 08 February 1996: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF CASTLE CAMPS SCHOOL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Lansdell | Chair | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Marchesi | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.03k | £4.26k | £3.09k | £5.27k | £7.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.97k | £4.28k | £2.20k | £2.64k | £10.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH NOVEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE STAF,PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ENHANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) AS THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNING BODY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE THE VILLAGE OF CASTLE CAMPS AND ITS ENVIRONS,INCLUDING OTHER VILLAGES IN THE SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Victoria Road
HAVERHILL
Suffolk
CB9 9PS
- Phone:
- 07808295224
- Email:
- friendsofccs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window