EUROPEAN HISTORICAL ECONOMICS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Produce scholarly journal, hold conferences, promote research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 February 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Neil Cummins | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Eric Schneider | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leigh Gardner | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.49k | £25.11k | £37.20k | £19.69k | £46.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.97k | £10.87k | £11.24k | £12.99k | £12.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 11 April 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 11 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 1996.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC HISTORY THROUGH THE STUDY OF EUROPEAN ECONOMICS AND ECONOMIC HISTORY, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE COMPARISON AND ANALYSIS OF EUROPEAN ECONOMIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
London School of Economics
Department of Economic History
Houghton Street
LONDON
WC2A 2AE
- Phone:
- 02079556427
- Email:
- kerstin.enflo@ekh.lu.se
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window