DEVON LINK-UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing voices & choices for Autistic people & people who have a learning disability. Devon Link Up supports people in building up links & networks in the community as well as supporting people in having a say in the way in which they live their lives. Also provides opportunities for people to have real lives in the community & gives opportunities for people to meet up with friends old and new.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 05 February 1996: Standard registration
- FREESPIRITS (Working name)
- LINK UP (Working name)
- SAY ADVOCACY SERVICES (Working name)
- ZEST (Working name)
- OTTERVALE ONE TO ONE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE ANN GILPIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew David Gardner | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Gilpin | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £332.21k | £176.41k | £190.07k | £253.40k | £177.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.24k | £218.34k | £247.87k | £293.04k | £168.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.00k | £1.77k | £21.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY LIMITATION: 1) PROMOTE THE INVOLVEMENT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CARE AND WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2) PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE INTEGRATION OF SUCH PERSONS INTO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heathfield Farm
Station Road
Broadclyst
Exeter
EX5 3AR
- Phone:
- 07733072326
- Email:
- contact@heathfieldfarm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window