VISITOR SUPPORT AT WELLINGBOROUGH PRISON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to provide emotional and practical support for families/friends visiting inmates at HMP Wellingborough. To achieve this the charity offers a variety of services in the visitors centre building - including seating and playspace, a snackbar, advice and information. Organised by staff and volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 February 1996: Standard registration
- 05 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE VISITORS CENTRE, WELLINGBOROUGH PRISON (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.10k | £34.56k | £34.45k | £28.55k | £31.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.34k | £32.88k | £33.33k | £25.91k | £30.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 17 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 01 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 07 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 18 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 12 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 28TH NOVEMBER 1995 AND 30TH JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
(A)THE CENTRE IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY (B)THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS - IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF PRISON VISITORS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF GOOD QUALITY SUPPORT IN A WELCOMING ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH THEIR COMMON INTERESTS AND CONCERNS ARE MET
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window